+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor