+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor