+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Filed