+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted
- Record vote
- Laid before the Senate
On May 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/21/2021
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On May 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/20/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
On November 17, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor