+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Received from the House
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed