+ − Actions (11)
On March 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Received from the House
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor