+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed