+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 29, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
- Posting rule suspended
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor