+ − Actions (7)
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor