+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 13, 2012 in the House:
- Filed