+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Filed