+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor