+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
- Signed in the Senate
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/1/2019
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/25/2019
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Administration
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor