+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor