+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/8/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (149)
Type:
Primary Sponsor