+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor