+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
- Signed in the Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment fails of adoption
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/17/2019
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Amendment withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order withdrawn
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/9/2019
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On December 18, 2018 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (97)
Type:
Primary Sponsor