+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Administration
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor