+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (10)
Patrick, Diane
Type:
Primary Sponsor