+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Filed