+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor