+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Filed