+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
On November 10, 2014 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor