+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read
- Laid before the Senate
- Received from the House
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor