+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Administration
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Thompson, Senfronia
Type:
Primary Sponsor