+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Filed