+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/29/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor