+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Filed