+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Record vote
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor