+ − Actions (13)
On June 4, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On May 29, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On May 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to House Administration
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor