+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On December 14, 2012 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor