+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 30, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On May 29, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Filed