+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
On November 9, 2020 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor