+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor