+ − Actions (7)
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Filed