+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On May 8, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/28/2021
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Filed