+ − Actions (16)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On June 2, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On June 1, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 5, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor