+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed