+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Filed