+ − Actions (26)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 8, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor