+ − Actions (37)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2009 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Government Organization
- Read first time
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 22, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor