+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor