+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 29, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor