+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor