+ − Actions (7)
On May 4, 2009 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 24, 2009 in the House:
- Filed