+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed