+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-sponsor authorized
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/13/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted as amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/4/2019
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor