+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/20/2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Adopted as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/6/2021
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed