+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
- Senate passage reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor