+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (51)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Finance
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed